U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jaber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • October 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 25, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 25, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 25, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 13, 2017: [Discovery]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Response]
  • May 22, 2017: [Request]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 17, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 17, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 16, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.