U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cr-40116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shooter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 01, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • June 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 19, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 19, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 19, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.