U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gunville
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 12, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • December 12, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2017: [Extend]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 31, 2017: [Jury List]
  • October 31, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 13, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2017: [Subpoena Issued]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • October 12, 2017: [Subpoena(s)]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 18, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 08, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 08, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Compel ]
  • August 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 15, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 15, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • August 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 08, 2017: [Suppress]
  • August 08, 2017: [Jury List]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 18, 2017: [Request]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 18, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.