U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50104
  • Case Name: Kristina Renee Ruch and Joshua Kade Ruch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiving Certain Fee (Text Order)]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2018
  • December 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • May 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.