U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 01, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 01, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 22, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 22, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 22, 2017: [Information - Felony]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.