U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50107
  • Case Name: Lacey Jennette Anderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.