U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 04, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 21, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • November 16, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 16, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 26, 2018: [Release from Custody]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 03, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 30, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 27, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 12, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 08, 2018: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • May 07, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 07, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [For Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 16, 2017: [Discovery]
  • June 15, 2017: [Response]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 13, 2017: [Discovery]
  • June 08, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.