U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poor Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • May 11, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 11, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 15, 2020: [Transcript]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Transcript]
  • October 15, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • October 14, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 14, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 02, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 02, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 25, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 19, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 26, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • January 14, 2019: [Extend]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 07, 2018: [Extend]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 08, 2018: [Redact Transcript]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 18, 2018: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • October 18, 2018: [Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 27, 2018: [New Trial]
  • July 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 27, 2018: [Acquittal]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 13, 2018: [Verdict]
  • July 13, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • July 13, 2018: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • July 13, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 13, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 13, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 12, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • July 10, 2018: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • July 10, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 10, 2018: [Jury List]
  • July 10, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 06, 2018: [Text Order]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • July 06, 2018: [Jury List]
  • July 02, 2018: [Brief]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 18, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • June 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • June 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 17, 2018: [Objection]
  • June 15, 2018: [Dismiss Count]
  • June 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [In Limine]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Objection]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 08, 2018: [In Limine]
  • June 08, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 07, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 15, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 14, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2017: [Arrest]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.