U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Teppo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 15, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 25, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 30, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 08, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 08, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 05, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 02, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2017: [Arrest]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.