U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Face
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 03, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 03, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 25, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.