U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sporrer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 13, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
May, 2018
  • May 28, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • May 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 22, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 28, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 28, 2017: [Compel ]
  • September 08, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2017: [Request]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 09, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2017: [Arrest]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.