U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Navarro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • December 01, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 09, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • November 01, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • November 01, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 01, 2017: [Verdict]
  • November 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 01, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 01, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 01, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 01, 2017: [Jury List]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Witness List]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 30, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 27, 2017: [Witness List]
  • October 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 23, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 18, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 13, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Request]
  • September 28, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 27, 2017: [Request]
  • September 26, 2017: [Response]
  • September 25, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • September 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 08, 2017: [Request]
  • September 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 23, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order for Warrant]
  • June 23, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Stipulation]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 24, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2017: [Request]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.