U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Standing Soldier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 09, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 19, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
  • May 07, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 19, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 12, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 10, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 28, 2020: [Furlough]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 11, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 06, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • January 25, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 31, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 31, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 31, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 31, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 03, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 18, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 23, 2017: [Waiver]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 19, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 19, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 19, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Request]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.