U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Younger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 22, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2020: [Competency Report]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • September 10, 2020: [Competency Evaluation]
  • September 09, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 18, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 18, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 07, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 24, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • April 02, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 02, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • March 14, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 13, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 13, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 29, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 13, 2017: [Furlough]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 17, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 28, 2017: [Extend]
  • July 26, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • July 24, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • July 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 09, 2017: [Request]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.