U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Featherman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • March 10, 2022: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 04, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 18, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • May 16, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Request]
  • April 10, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 30, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 01, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 01, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 01, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 29, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 11, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.