U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pacheco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 13, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 13, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
May, 2018
  • May 28, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • May 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 10, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2017: [Furlough]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 25, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 24, 2017: [Text Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 24, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.