U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 16, 2017: [Consent]
  • June 16, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 14, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 06, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 24, 2017: [Text Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 24, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.