U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40211
  • Case Name: Dale Robert Zuraff
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case (Text Order) Ch 13]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
August, 2017
  • August 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.