U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10058
  • Case Name: Jordan David Rose
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
April, 2019
  • April 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • June 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required) (Court)]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.