U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50114
  • Case Name: Bryan Scott Jolley and Kathleen NMN Croft-Jolley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
June, 2018
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reply]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • September 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • August 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • July 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
May, 2017
  • May 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismissing Corporate Joint Debtor]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.