U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 27, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 31, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • December 12, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 12, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 05, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • December 05, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 21, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 21, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2017: [Brief]
  • November 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 16, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 30, 2017: [Discovery]
  • June 15, 2017: [Response]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2017: [Request]
  • June 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2017: [Bail Report]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 31, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.