U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50126
  • Case Name: John William Barton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case (Text Order) Ch 13]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Convert Case to 13]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Case to 13]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Convert Case to 13 (no fee required)]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Case to 13 (no fee required)]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • August 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case 707(b) by UST]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.