U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maldonado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 13, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 08, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.