U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10064
  • Case Name: Jimmy Kent Peiker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
July, 2018
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacate Order]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reply]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacating Order]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacate Order]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacate Order (No Notice Required)]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case (Text Order) Ch 13]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
April, 2018
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
March, 2018
  • March 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
  • January 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Status Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • September 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Codebtor Stay]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reply]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Complaint]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Codebtor Stay (Ch 12 & 13 only)]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transcript (First Meeting of Creditors)]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required)]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.