U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spotted Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 09, 2019: [Forfeiture]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 20, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 20, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 13, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • June 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 09, 2017: [Request]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2017: [Request]
  • June 08, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 08, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 08, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.