U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-05005
  • Case Name: Allred v. Kerkvliet
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • December 30, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (fee required)]
  • December 02, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 21, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • October 18, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Answer (Amended)]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • June 07, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 25, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • October 24, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
  • September 28, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Interrogatory Answers]
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Production of Documents]
  • August 14, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Interrogatories]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 10, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • July 10, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 10, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • June 09, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • June 09, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summons Issued]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.