U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40237
  • Case Name: Bradley Allen Koster and Holly Ann Koster
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
April, 2019
  • April 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
May, 2018
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
August, 2017
  • August 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement Re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.