U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woodford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 27, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 15, 2017: [Request]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 12, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.