U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 21, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 21, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 31, 2018: [Request]
  • May 30, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 30, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 19, 2017: [Request]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.