U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50090-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Hawk et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • January 24, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 20, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Appeal Record Returned]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
  • February 16, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 15, 2021: [Transcript]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Response]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 15, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 09, 2020: [Brief]
  • June 09, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 05, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 04, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 03, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 02, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 26, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [New Trial]
  • September 12, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 09, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 23, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 22, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • August 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Restitution Related Document (attorney use)]
  • August 15, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 14, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 01, 2019: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 03, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 03, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • May 03, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 03, 2019: [Verdict]
  • May 03, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • May 03, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • May 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 03, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 03, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2019: [Response]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • April 29, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 29, 2019: [Jury List]
  • April 29, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 24, 2019: [Response]
  • April 24, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 24, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 23, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2019: [Response]
  • April 18, 2019: [Suppress]
  • April 18, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 17, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Response]
  • April 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 12, 2019: [Disclosure ]
  • April 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [Suppress]
  • April 10, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2019: [Subpoena Issued]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 01, 2019: [Subpoena(s)]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 20, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 25, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 11, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 02, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 21, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 05, 2018: [Joinder]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Response]
  • August 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 26, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 22, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 21, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 21, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 04, 2018: [Extend]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 31, 2018: [Request]
  • May 31, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 31, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 31, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 21, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 02, 2018: [Extend]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 02, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 01, 2018: [Extend]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Joinder]
  • January 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • January 22, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 10, 2018: [Transcript]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • December 13, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 13, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 30, 2017: [Witness List]
  • November 27, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 02, 2017: [Extend]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2017: [Suppress]
  • October 26, 2017: [Joinder]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 13, 2017: [Suppress]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 06, 2017: [Joinder]
  • October 05, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 02, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 28, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 28, 2017: [Sever Defendant]
  • September 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2017: [Request]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 03, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 26, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.