U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dupris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 25, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 13, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 27, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 09, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 10, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 09, 2017: [Release from Custody]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 21, 2017: [Furlough]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
July, 2017
  • July 29, 2017: [Furlough]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 20, 2017: [Furlough]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 16, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 16, 2017: [Request]
  • June 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.