U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Longbrake et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 27, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 05, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 05, 2020: [Release from Custody]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 07, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 10, 2020: [Furlough]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 02, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 02, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 16, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 05, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 05, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 05, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • December 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 05, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 05, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 18, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • September 18, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • September 18, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2018: [Restitution Related Document (attorney use)]
  • September 11, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 22, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 22, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 04, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Certificate]
  • April 18, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • April 02, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 02, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 02, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • April 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 19, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 06, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 05, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 05, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Furlough]
  • January 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • January 19, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • January 04, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • December 20, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 11, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2017: [Request]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 15, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 15, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 01, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 11, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • October 10, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 18, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 18, 2017: [Furlough]
  • July 18, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 11, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Request]
  • June 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2017: [Request]
  • June 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 16, 2017: [Request]
  • June 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 15, 2017: [Request]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.