U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 31, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • April 14, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 21, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 07, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • August 06, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 03, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 24, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 01, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 31, 2017: [Request]
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 31, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 31, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 31, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 28, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 28, 2017: [Request]
  • July 27, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2017: [Arrest]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.