U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 31, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 17, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 03, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 22, 2017: [Request]
  • June 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 22, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 21, 2017: [Request]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 20, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 19, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.