U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santizo Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 08, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 08, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 07, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 13, 2017: [Discovery]
  • July 06, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Response]
  • June 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.