U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zotti
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2022: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 30, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 30, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 17, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 17, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 29, 2018: [Release from Custody]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 26, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 26, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2017: [Status Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 14, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 14, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2017: [Request]
  • June 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 20, 2017: [Request]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.