U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 16, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 15, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 24, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 24, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Request]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.