U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ziegler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 07, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 21, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 15, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 27, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 14, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 17, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 27, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • September 27, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 27, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 24, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 10, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 09, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 04, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • February 09, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 09, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 15, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 08, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2017: [Subpoena Issued]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2017: [Reply]
  • September 08, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 08, 2017: [Response]
  • September 08, 2017: [Reply]
  • September 07, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • August 31, 2017: [Reply]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 29, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order]
  • August 22, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • August 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 22, 2017: [Suppress]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 14, 2017: [Request]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.