U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 30, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 15, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.