U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flageolle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 03, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 16, 2020: [Forfeiture]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 08, 2019: [Consent]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 24, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 24, 2019: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • January 22, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 27, 2018: [Seal Existing Document]
  • September 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 21, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 12, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 30, 2018: [Text Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • April 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • February 23, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 20, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 30, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • September 08, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.