U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steele
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 22, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 14, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • November 14, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 14, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 14, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Verdict]
  • November 14, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 13, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 13, 2017: [Jury List]
  • November 09, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 09, 2017: [Response]
  • November 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 08, 2017: [Witness List]
  • November 07, 2017: [Witness List]
  • November 03, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 01, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 31, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 31, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 30, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 30, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 26, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 24, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 18, 2017: [Response]
  • October 13, 2017: [Brief]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 10, 2017: [Response]
  • October 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order]
  • July 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 28, 2017: [Request]
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 21, 2017: [Request]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.