U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. High Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 28, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 05, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 05, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 15, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 06, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 06, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 06, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 06, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 29, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Objection]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 13, 2017: [Extend]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 18, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 05, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2017: [Request]
  • June 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.