U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knight
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 01, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 21, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 20, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Objection]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 12, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • February 07, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 07, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Verdict]
  • February 07, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • February 07, 2018: [Response to Jury Question]
  • February 07, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 07, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 06, 2018: [Jury List]
  • February 06, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice]
  • February 05, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 02, 2018: [In Limine]
  • February 02, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 02, 2018: [Witness List]
  • February 01, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 30, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 23, 2018: [Jury List]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Objection]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 16, 2017: [In Limine]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 28, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 23, 2017: [Request]
  • June 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 16, 2017: [Request]
  • June 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.