U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tatar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 24, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 18, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Extend]
  • February 12, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 14, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 02, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • December 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 27, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.