U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Passport - Return of]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 07, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 26, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2017: [Request]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 15, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.