U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Coat
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 12, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 14, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 14, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 08, 2017: [Extend]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 10, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 18, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 18, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2017: [Request]
  • June 15, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 15, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 15, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.