U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tobacco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 06, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 06, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 01, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 19, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • July 17, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 19, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 19, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.