U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 19, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Appeal Record Returned]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 27, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 12, 2020: [Transcript]
  • May 05, 2020: [DEACTIVATED_Seal]
  • May 05, 2020: [Transcript Redaction Request]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • April 28, 2020: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • April 10, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 06, 2020: [Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • February 19, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 06, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 06, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 10, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 17, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • August 29, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 29, 2019: [Verdict]
  • August 29, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • August 29, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 29, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 29, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 27, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 27, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • August 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 27, 2019: [Text Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Jury List]
  • August 26, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 26, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2019: [Discovery]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 20, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 19, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 08, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 08, 2019: [Response]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 05, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 01, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 30, 2019: [Response]
  • July 29, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 20, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 19, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 19, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 18, 2019: [Objection]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • June 18, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 18, 2019: [~Util - Document Sealed]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Competency Report]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2019: [1 - Ex Parte Docket Entry AND Document]
  • April 02, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • March 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 25, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 25, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 25, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 14, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
January, 2019
  • January 27, 2019: [Response]
  • January 24, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 24, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 26, 2018: [Extend]
  • November 08, 2018: [Extend]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 22, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 15, 2018: [Extend]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 10, 2018: [Extend]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 28, 2018: [Transcript]
  • August 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2018: [Status Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • July 24, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • July 24, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 13, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 11, 2018: [Transcript]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 25, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Receipt]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 12, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 01, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 21, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 16, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Suppress]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • September 11, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 11, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2017: [Request]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 01, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 28, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2017: [Request]
  • June 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 19, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 19, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.