U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-30073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rabbitt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 24, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 29, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 29, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • June 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 30, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 30, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 24, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 18, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 11, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order Modifying Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.