U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sosa-Obregon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 05, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 13, 2017: [Response]
  • July 13, 2017: [Discovery]
  • July 07, 2017: [Request]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 30, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 30, 2017: [Interpreter No Longer Needed]
  • June 30, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 30, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.